Houston Casualty Company v. Paul Ryan Associates
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02956 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 30, 2018 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Paul Ryan Associates, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Houston Casualty Company
13403 Northwest Freeway
Houston, TX 77040 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Paul Ryan Associates, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Smith, Cyril) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Norris Stavis on behalf of Paul Ryan Associates, Inc.. (Stavis, George) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Paul Ryan Associates Inc., d/b/a Ryan Associates, issued on February 12, 2019. (dt) |
|
16 | 16
![]() DECLARATION of Cyril E. Smith in Support re:15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Smith, Cyril) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Smith, Cyril) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
Tue 02/12 9:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Cyrill Smith. RE-FILE Document No. 13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name for the party who was served; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - lists the correct name of the party who was served, Paul Ryan Associates, Inc., d/b/a Ryan associates, by personally serving Nora Dindyal, its registered Agent in New York, on April 11, 2018, etc., etc., then separately re-file the Declaration in Support of the new filing of the Clerk's Certificate of Default.(dt) |
||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() DECLARATION of Cyril E. Smith in Support re:13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Smith, Cyril) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Smith, Cyril) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Ryan Associates, Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. Service was accepted by C T Corporation System, Registered Agent. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Smith, Cyril) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Ryan Associates, Inc. (vf) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Cyril Elliot Smith on behalf of Houston Casualty Company. New Address: DLA PIPER LLP (US), 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, 10020, 212.335.4500. (Smith, Cyril) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aidan Middlemiss McCormack on behalf of Houston Casualty Company. (McCormack, Aidan) |
|
8 | 8
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(McCormack, Aidan) |
|
7 | 7
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Ryan Associates, Inc., re:5 Complaint,. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (McCormack, Aidan) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCormack, Aidan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() COMPLAINT against Paul Ryan Associates, Inc.. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(McCormack, Aidan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/04 10:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cyril Elliot Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Houston Casualty Company; Paul Ryan Associates, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/04 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Cyril Elliot Smith to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/04 10:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cyril Elliot Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/04 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Cyril Elliot Smith to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant name must match in "To" field exactly as it appears on pleading and caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/04 10:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/04 10:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/04 10:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Smith, Cyril) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Ryan Associates, Inc. d/b/a Ryan Associates, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Smith, Cyril) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Cyril) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Paul Ryan Associates, Inc. d/b/a Ryan Associates. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14895507)Document filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Smith, Cyril) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |