California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:18-cv-02690
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2018
Terminated:Nov 15, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Sep 30, 2018 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Video Equipment Rentals, LLC
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Full Throttle Films, LLC
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Revolution Display, LLC
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Defendant
VER Technologies Holdco LLC
757 W California Ave
Glendale, CA 91203
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Defendant
VER Technologies LLC
757 W California Ave
Glendale, CA 91203
Represented By
Thomas D Kohler
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D3 LED, LLC
Represented By
Antoinette Marie Tease
Antoinette M Tease PLLC
contact info
Ned M Gelhaar
Enenstein Pham And Glass
contact info
Teri T Pham
Enenstein Pham And Glass
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 15, 2018
49 49 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Mon 11/19 10:29 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal
48 48 order Dismissing Case Mon 11/19 10:13 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case47 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
47 47 stip Dismiss Case Tue 11/13 11:24 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC.(Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Thursday, October 18, 2018
46 46 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 10/18 11:32 AM
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC.(Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Dec. of B.Robertus,
Att: 2 Declaration Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Dec. of T.Tease,
Att: 16 Proof of Service
Monday, October 08, 2018
45 45 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/08 5:07 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant VER Technologies Holdco LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
44 44 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/08 5:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant VER Technologies LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
43 43 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/01 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying REVOLUTION DISPLAY, LLC; FULL THROTTLE FILMS, LLC; VIDEO EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC; VER TECHNOLOGIES LLC; VER TECHNOLOGIES HOLDCO LLC; Production Resource Group, Inc; Production Resource Group II, Inc.. (Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
42 42 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 09/20 1:34 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order is attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Dismiss Case Thu 09/20 1:20 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Does, Full Throttle Films, LLC, Revolution Display, LLC, VER Technologies Holdco LLC, VER Technologies LLC, Video Equipment Rentals, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
40 40 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 09/19 11:36 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Does, Full Throttle Films, LLC, Revolution Display, LLC, VER Technologies Holdco LLC, VER Technologies LLC, Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party Full Throttle Films, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party Revolution Display, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party VER Technologies Holdco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party VER Technologies LLC(pty:dft))(Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, August 27, 2018
39 39 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 08/28 11:22 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Deadline to file First Amended Complaint August 22, 2018; Deadline to file dispositive motion September 19, 2018; Opposition October 19, 2018; Reply November 16, 2018; Hearing on motion November 26 or 29, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
38 38 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/23 9:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition34 as to defendant VER Technologies Holdco LLC. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/23 9:20 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition34 as to defendant VER Technologies LLC. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
36 36 notice Summons Request Wed 08/22 11:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition34 D3 LED, LLC. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Summons Request Wed 08/22 11:48 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition34 D3 LED, LLC. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
34 34 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 08/22 10:58 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Does, Full Throttle Films, LLC, Revolution Display, LLC, Video Equipment Rentals, LLC, VER Technologies LLC, VER Technologies Holdco LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 08/21 12:14 PM
STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY AND JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
32 32 minutes Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/14 10:41 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to August 27, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to file a joint status report by noon on August 21, 2018. Scheduling dates will be included in the report if stay in bankruptcy action is lifted. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 08/09 10:27 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Pham, Teri)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
30 30 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/11 3:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court stays the above-entitled action based on the Notice filed on June 8, 2018. A status conference is set for August 13, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed by noon on August 9, 2018. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
29 29 misc Miscellaneous Document Fri 06/08 12:42 PM
Notice Regarding Automatic Stay of Proceedings - Confirmation of Stay(Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
28 28 10 pgs order Order Wed 06/06 11:28 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
27 27 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 05/31 10:24 AM
ORDER FOR STIPULATED MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)26 . Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC's answer due 6/8/2018. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
26 26 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 05/25 11:16 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 8, 2018 filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
25 25 order Transfer Pursuant to Patent Pilot Program (CV-128) Wed 05/23 3:33 PM
ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:18-cv-2690 GW (JCx). (esa)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/23 9:10 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
23 23 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 05/22 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MDJAP case from Magistrate Judge Michale R. Wilner to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-02690 DSF (JCx). (esa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
22 22 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/30 10:48 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Video Equipment Rentals, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018; Full Throttle Films, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018; Revolution Display, LLC answer now due 5/30/2018, filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Attorney Thomas D Kohler added to party Video Equipment Rentals, LLC(pty:dft))(Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
21 21 respoth Administrative Record Wed 04/25 1:28 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Suggestion on Pendency of Brankruptcy filed by Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC.(Kohler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, April 20, 2018
20 20 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 04/20 9:25 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/16 3:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Agent authorized to receive service of process for CSC Lawyers Inc Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/16 3:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant Revolution Display, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Agent authorized to receive service of process for CSC Lawyers Inc Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/16 3:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, upon Defendant Full Throttle Films, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Agent authorized to receive service of process for CSC Lawyers Inc Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/12 12:51 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Antoinette M. Tease APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of D3 LED, LLC, designating Teri T. Pham as local counsel. (vm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 04/11 6:21 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antoinette M. Tease to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 4/10/2018, Receipt No. 21562943) filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 04/11 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antoinette M. Tease to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21562943)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Electronic, image or stamp signature is not allowed. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/10 2:53 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antoinette M. Tease to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21562943) filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order o n Application
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Wed 04/04 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Antoinette Marie Tease. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/04 10:56 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Video Equipment Rentals, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/04 10:51 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Full Throttle Films, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/04 10:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Revolution Display, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Wed 04/04 10:44 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11- Statement of Consent
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
7 7 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 04/03 9:31 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Tue 04/03 9:25 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 04/03 9:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 04/03 9:23 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/03 9:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC, identifying D3 LED, LLC; REVOLUTION DISPLAY, LLC; FULL THROTTLE FILMS, LLC; & VIDEO EQUIPMENT RENTALS, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/03 9:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/03 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21517262 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff D3 LED, LLC. (Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party D3 LED, LLC(pty:pla))(Gelhaar, Ned)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 & 2