Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01111
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2018
Terminated:Nov 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tetra Tech Inc.
Represented By
Tetra Tech Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/03 2:11 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1111 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 11/01 5:20 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Against Tetra Tech Inc. Related [+] Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 05/18 10:25 AM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/27 2:57 PM
Order Signed on 4/27/2021 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
10 10 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 02/20 3:52 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, October 15, 2018
8 8 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/15 11:59 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Mark G. Ledwin on behalf of Tetra Tech Inc.. (Ledwin, Mark)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/19 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Mark G. Ledwin on behalf of Tetra Tech Inc.. (Ledwin, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 8:44 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,3
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 2:13 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Tetra Tech Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 12:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/13 11:56 AM
Amended Complaint against Tetra Tech Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 1:55 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/04 3:04 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/4/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/04 12:48 PM
Adversary case 18-01111 Complaint against Tetra Tech Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]