City of Pittsfield v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45335 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 3:18-cv-30040 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:26 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Burlington Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Pittsfield
DeRosa Dohoney, LLP Beacon Office Complex 55 North Street #304
Pittsfield, MA 01201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:10 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT 3:18-cv-30040 City of Pittsfield v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7051340 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by City of Pittsfield.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice). [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 18 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
5 | 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-18 in MDL Case Number 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Case transferred to the District of Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 4/4/2018. Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 4/4/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 3:18-cv-30040. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |