Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01115
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2018
Terminated:Nov 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Accent Design
Represented By
Accent Design
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/20 11:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1115 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2019
18 18 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 11/18 12:16 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Friday, November 15, 2019
17 17 misc PDF Notice Fri 11/15 11:34 AM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 order Judgment Fri 11/15 11:33 AM
Judgment signed on 11/15/2019. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Accent Design, in a total judgment as of $56,467.01 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 19,0049 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, November 14, 2019
15 15 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 11/14 2:51 PM
Order signed on 11/14/2019 for Default Judgment. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 11, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/11 2:34 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 04, 2019
13 13 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Fri 10/04 2:06 PM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 11/1/19 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 10/29/19 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2019 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/29/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 06/10 5:22 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Entry of Default Judgement Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 9
Saturday, June 01, 2019
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sun 06/02 12:25 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Friday, May 31, 2019
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 05/31 10:38 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
9 9 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 2:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Accent Design. Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 1:11 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Summons, Complaint and COS
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 1:32 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 11:57 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
5 5 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 10:51 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/08 10:18 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 06/06 12:03 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Accent Design . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 06/05 11:51 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/05 2:55 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/7/2018, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/05 9:03 AM
Adversary case 18-01115 Complaint against Accent Design to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]