Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01128
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Prologis Perth Amboy Associates, LLC
Represented By
Prologis Perth Amboy Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/29 3:28 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1128 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
7 7 notice Notice, Dismissal Thu 11/29 4:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, June 18, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 6:45 PM
Amended Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, June 15, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/15 6:37 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,3
Thursday, June 14, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 2:23 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Prologis Perth Amboy Associates, LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/13 12:01 PM
Amended Complaint against Prologis Perth Amboy Associates, LLC (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 1:59 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/05 3:46 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/7/2018, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/05 10:06 AM
Adversary case 18-01128 Complaint against Prologis Perth Amboy Associates, LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]