Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:18-cr-00621
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2018
Last checked: Friday Apr 06, 2018 3:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Ortiz (1)
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Cordova
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amy Marie Hail
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/06/2018 3:18 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
Arrest of Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz (ccl) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/07/18 as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz. (mgc) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz. (ccl) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz (1)by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz. (mgc) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz. (mgc) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz held on 3/9/2018; Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/14/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia; SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz (Court Reporter FTR-Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz Joseph Anthony Cordova for Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz appointed.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mgc) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz (Cordova, Joseph) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Oriz. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
7 7 NOTICE ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Ortiz (Cordova, Joseph) [2:18-mj-02072-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
8 8 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Benjamin Emilio Siguenza-Ortiz (1) count(s) 1. (jaw)
Related: [-] dacted Version