Calhoun County, Florida v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45363 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Northern, 5:18-cv-00067 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:29 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Calhoun County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 3:17 PM EST |
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 229 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4124044.), filed by CALHOUN COUNTY FLORIDA. (MOUGEY, PETER) [Transferred from flnd on 4/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 4/5/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE re pending transfer received from MDL Panel, with attached copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-18), signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/4/2018 re MDL No. 2804. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 4/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 CTO-18 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18), certified copy w/ email request from Clerk, Northern District of Ohio, re MDL 2804 (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 4/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 CTO-18 | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 3 pgs CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern. Case number 5:18-cv-00067. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |