Original Case: 4:12-cv-00195

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:12-cv-02452
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2012
Terminated:Feb 22, 2013
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2016 1:03 PM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Matthew D. Guletz
THOMPSON & COBURN
contact info
Christopher Martin Hohn
THOMPSON & COBURN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BIS Investment, LLC
Represented By
David Jay Bernstein
contact info

GPO Feb 22 2013
PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Michael J. Melloy and Duane Benton (UNPUBLISHED) [4007258] [12-2452]

Docket last updated: 01/12/2016 1:03 PM CST
Tuesday, June 19, 2012
Civil case docketed. [3923496] 12-2452 (PSA)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum and order filed 6/12/12 [3923522] 12-2452 (PSA)
Related: [-]