James Hand, et al v. Rick Scott, et al
Original Case: 4:17-cv-00128
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-prici-11388 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 3:37 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR EQUAL OPPORTUNITY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DEMOS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN PROBATION AND PAROLE ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE SENTENCING PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MICHIGAN
|
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF LOUISIANA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF KANSAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ALABAMA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MISSOURI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
RICK SCOTT, In his official capacity as Governor of Florida and member of the State of Florida's Executive Clemency Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JIMMY PATRONIS, In his official capacity as Chief Financial Officer and member of the Executive Clememcy Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ADAM H. PUTNAM, In his official capacity as Commissioner of Agriculture and member of the Executive Clemency Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PAM BONDI, In her official cacpacity as the Attorney General of Florida and member of the Executive Clemency Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
RICK SCOTT, In his official capacity as Governor of Florida and member if the State of Florida's Executive Clemency Board
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES MICHAEL HAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES LARRY EXLINE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JERMAINE JOHNEKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM BASS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
HAROLD W. GIRCSIS, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 10 2020
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Pam Bondi, Jimmy Patronis, Adam H. Putnam and Rick Scott. Decision: Vacated and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. |
Docket last updated: 01/14/2020 3:37 AM EST |