Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01148
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System
Represented By
OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/29 3:50 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1148 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
13 13 notice Notice, Dismissal Fri 08/02 3:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
12 12 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Wed 07/24 9:57 AM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A. Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
11 11 misc Affidavit Fri 12/21 4:11 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, October 26, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/26 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Marie Polito Hofsdal on behalf of OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System. (Hofsdal, Marie)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Fri 10/26 1:08 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Marie Polito Hofsdal on behalf of OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System. (Hofsdal, Marie)
Related: [-] 4
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/26 1:02 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Marie Polito Hofsdal on behalf of OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System. (Hofsdal, Marie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/26 12:57 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System. (Chiu, Conrad)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/29 8:03 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Monday, June 25, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 06/25 4:26 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/25 11:58 AM
Amended Complaint against OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/25 1:03 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 10:38 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, April 09, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/09 2:41 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/9/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/09 10:33 AM
Adversary case 18-01148 Complaint against OTR Nominee of State Teachers Retirement System to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 04/09 4:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01148 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12518544. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1