Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01151
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
PowerGuard Specialty Insurance Services
Represented By
PowerGuard Specialty Insurance Services
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, February 01, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/01 9:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1151 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
8 8 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 03/25 10:22 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, January 17, 2019
7 7 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Thu 01/17 10:06 AM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/05 10:48 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Affidavit Fri 10/05 9:47 AM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/08 11:08 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 06/06 4:04 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against PowerGuard Specialty Insurance Services . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/06 9:21 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/09 2:41 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/9/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/09 10:40 AM
Adversary case 18-01151 Complaint against PowerGuard Specialty Insurance Services to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 04/09 4:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01151 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12518544. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1