Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01170
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:May 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steel Connections, Inc.
Represented By
Steel Connections, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/24 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1170 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 05/18 4:36 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Krista Kulp on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Kulp, Krista)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 05/19 11:36 AM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/28 1:08 PM
Order Signed on 4/28/2021 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
5 5 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
4 4 misc Affidavit Mon 06/25 10:52 AM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
3 3 answer None Wed 05/09 10:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Patrick W. Carothers on behalf of Steel Connections, Inc.. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 1 ,2
Monday, April 09, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/09 3:50 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/9/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/09 12:14 PM
Adversary case 18-01170 Complaint against Steel Connections, Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 04/09 4:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01170 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12518544. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1