Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01173
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:Dec 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sunergy Construction Inc.
Represented By
Sunergy Construction Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, December 29, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/29 3:38 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1173 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
33 33 misc Transcript Wed 01/03 4:12 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/13/2023 at 10:44 AM RE: Motion filed by the Plaintiff for Default Judgment. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/18/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/26/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/18/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/18/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
32 32 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 12/16 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 12/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #31 )
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
31 31 misc PDF Notice Wed 12/13 5:16 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 30
30 30 1 pgs order Judgment Wed 12/13 5:15 PM
Judgment signed on 12/13/2023. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Sunergy Construction Inc., in a total judgment as of $780,662.32 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 23,0025 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 29
29 29 order Motion, Default Judgment Wed 12/13 1:15 PM
Order for Default Judgment Signed on 12/13/2023. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 25
Friday, December 08, 2023
28 28 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Fri 12/08 5:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, December 07, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/07 12:51 PM
Certificate of Service for SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Sunergy Construction Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
26 26 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/23 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 11/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
25 25 6 pgs motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 11/21 10:04 AM
Motion for Default Judgment (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Default Judgment) Related [+] filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) Responses due by 12/6/2023, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Pretrial Conference Order
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Entry of Default and Proof of Service Thereof
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Order
Monday, November 20, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/20 8:38 PM
Certificate of Service for Clerk's Entry of Default against Sunergy Construction Inc. Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 1 pgs misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 11/20 12:02 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Sunergy Construction Inc. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, November 13, 2023
22 22 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 11/13 2:07 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ)(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 09, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/09 7:00 PM
Certificate of Service for SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 2 pgs misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/09 5:38 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Second Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Pretrial Conference Order
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Default
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/10 11:49 AM
Order Signed on 10/10/2023 Scheduling Continued Pre-Trial Status Conference and Certain Deadline. A Pre-Trial Status Conference Will be Held on 11/9/2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
19 19 misc Transcript Fri 10/13 11:42 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 9/28/2023 RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/4/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScr i ber s, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/13/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/6/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/4/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Wed 08/23 10:52 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order Signed on 8/23/2023 Regarding Status Report. A Status Conference Will be Held on 9/28/2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 08/16 5:27 PM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, August 04, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 08/05 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
14 14 order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Wed 08/02 12:31 PM
Order Signed on 8/2/2023 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
13 13 1 pgs misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Tue 08/10 4:39 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Christopher J. Battaglia on behalf of Christopher J. Battaglia. (Battaglia, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Tue 05/18 3:54 PM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/28 1:21 PM
Order Signed on 4/28/2021 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
9 9 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/16 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 2 pgs misc Affidavit Fri 11/16 2:14 PM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/20 10:23 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
5 5 1 pgs cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 06/19 1:02 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Sunergy Construction Inc.. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
4 4 16 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/18 11:27 AM
Amended Complaint against Sunergy Construction Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/18 12:27 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 12:24 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, April 09, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/09 3:50 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/9/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/09 12:52 PM
Adversary case 18-01173 Complaint against Sunergy Construction Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 04/09 4:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01173 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12518544. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1