J & J Sports Productions Inc. v. Pineda et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Bagley Amon |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02100 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 07, 2018 4:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
Maria C. Pineda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
J & J Sports Productions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Carlos Cardenas
40-25 221st
Bayside, NY 11361 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc.
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Maria C. Pineda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/21 2:46 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (Fernandez, Erica) |
||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Wed 12/19 12:54 PM
Order Dismissing Parties: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc. and or their counsel, hereby give notice that the above captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc., an unknown business entity d/b/a Puerto Columbia. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/18/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 12/17 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J & J Sports Productions Inc. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 12/04 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER -- The plaintiff is respectfully directed to file a status report by December 18, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/4/2018. (Roantree, Bronwyn) |
||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Thu 11/29 9:29 AM
Order Dismissing Parties: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned action, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the above-captioned action, as regards Maria C. Pineda individually and d/b/a/ Puerto Colombia only, be, and the same hereby is, dismissed, with prejudice with each party to this action bearing its own Attorneys' fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/27/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 11/21 12:49 PM
ORDER re32 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Maria C Pineda individually and dba Puerto Columbia only by J & J Sports Productions Inc. -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, the conference scheduled for November 26, 2018 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/21/2018. (Roantree, Bronwyn) |
||
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/20 4:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Maria C Pineda individually and dba Puerto Columbia only by J & J Sports Productions Inc. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 10/22 9:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Settlement Conference held on 10/22/2018. SCHEDULING: The next telephone conference will be held on November 26, 2018, 12:30 p.m. SUMMARY: The appearing parties agreed to settle the case. If they file a stipulation of dismissal before the next conference scheduled above, I will cancel it; otherwise I respectfully direct the plaintiff's counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 10/16 4:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 10/16/2018. SCHEDULING: The next settlement conference will be held on October 22, 2018, 9:30 a.m.SUMMARY: As set forth on the record, I will adjourn the damages inquest as to the defaulting defendant without date, pending resolution of the adversarial proceedings and in light of the plaintiff's inability to serve a subpoena on its own investigator. Instead, the parties will discuss settlement at the next conference scheduled above. No later than October 19, 2018, each party must submit an ex parte statement of settlement position by email (NOT by ECF) to[LINK:orenstein_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Each statement must include the terms on which the party is willing to settle the case, whether those terms are negotiable, and an explanation of that position. These statements will be treated as confidential, and will not be docketed. Meaningful settlement discussions will occur at the next conference; clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be present or immediately available by telephone. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/15 4:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by J & J Sports Productions Inc. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/05 11:01 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on for October 10, 2018 by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/05 2:31 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The damages inquest previously scheduled for October 10, 2018, is rescheduled for October 22, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/5/2018. (Roantree, Bronwyn) |
||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 09/20 4:11 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 09/10 1:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 5, 2018 served on Puerto Colombia Restaurant, Inc. & Catania Trigo Facher, Esq. on September 10, 2018, filed by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/05 4:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re24 MOTION for Default Judgment -- A hearing to determine the amount of damages, if any, that should be awarded on the basis of the defendant's default will be held before me at the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York, on October 10, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The plaintiff is directed to submit any written materials in support of its request for damages, including any affidavits, exhibits, or memoranda of law that the plaintiff wishes me to consider, as well as a list of all witnesses who will testify at the hearing, no later than September 26, 2018, with copies simultaneously provided to the defendant. This will be the plaintiff's final opportunity to present argument or evidence in support of any request for relief. The plaintiff is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the defendant and to electronically file proof of such service with the court no later than September 12, 2018. Any defendant that wishes to make a submission in response must do so no later than October 3, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/5/2018. (Drake, Shaw) |
|
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 09/05 10:05 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment24 is respectfully referred to The Honorable James Orenstein, United States Magistrate Judge. So ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/5/2018. (Stern, Ethan) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 08/30 11:33 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Puerto Colombia Restaurant, Inc. only by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Judgment | ||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Transcript
Thu 08/16 9:36 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 10, 2018, before Judge Orenstein. Court Transcriber: Typewrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/10 6:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria C. Pineda. Carlos Cardenas served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018; Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
Att: 1 Summons returned executed | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/10 10:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: July 10, 2018. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: October 5, 2018. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: September 28, 2018. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): October 16, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. All discovery to be completed by: December 3, 2018. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): December 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: January 2, 2019. Joint pretrial order due by: February 5, 2019. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/10/2018. (Orenstein, James) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 07/10 9:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/10/2018. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on October 16, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on December 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Summary: I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the appearing parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/09 5:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Third Party Complaint Carlos Cardenas on July 5, 2018, filed by Maria C. Pineda. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/09 5:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Third Party Complaint Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. on July 5, 2018, filed by Maria C. Pineda. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/05 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Loughlin on behalf of J & J Sports Productions Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Loughlin, Joseph) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 07/05 10:31 AM
NOTICE by J & J Sports Productions Inc. re11 Scheduling Order,,, joint proposed discovery plan (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 06/15 2:43 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/14 10:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J & J Sports Productions Inc. re13 Request for Certificate of Default , Proposed Clerk's Certificate & Affidavit in Support as to Puerto Colombia only (Hunter, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Thu 06/14 10:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by J & J Sports Productions Inc. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Clerk's Certificate as to Puerto Colombia only | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Mon 06/11 12:50 PM
First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc., Carlos Cardenas, filed by Maria C. Pineda. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/11 11:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, July 10, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than July 6, 2018, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/11/2018. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Mon 06/11 11:52 AM
ORDER -- A review of docket entry6 in this action indicates that the defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. was served with the summons and complaint April 11, 2018, and its answer was due on May 2, 2018, but to date has not been filed. No later than June 25, 2018, one of the following events must occur: (a) Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. must file its answer, (b) the parties must file a stipulation extending defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant's time to answer, or (c) the plaintiff must file a request for a certificate of default. If none of the preceding events occurs by the deadline set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case against Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case against them for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/11/2018. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/04 7:47 PM
Defendant Pineda ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Maria C. Pineda. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/15 10:27 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Maria C. Pineda. (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/15 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catania Trigo Facher on behalf of Maria C. Pineda (aty to be noticed) (Trigo Facher, Catania) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/15 11:23 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted. To the extent the handwritten alteration to the parties' stipulation bears only one set of initials, that amendment of the printed text does not appear to be a fully executed amendment and is therefore of no effect. Defendant Maria C. Pineda's time to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to June 4, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/15/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/27 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. Maria C. Pineda served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/20 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/09 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Maria C. Pineda, Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summon | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/09 3:19 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/09 3:18 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/09 1:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Sports Productions Inc. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/09 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Maria C. Pineda, Puerto Colombia Restaurant Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10339620 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by J & J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/09 3:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |