Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Christopher C Conner
Case #: 1:18-cv-00762
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2018
Terminated:Apr 17, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 03, 2018 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Iron Power, Inc.
Defendant
Rocky Kimbrew
Plaintiff
McGrew Equipment Company
Represented By
Michael S. Katz
Barley Snyder
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 16, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/16 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by McGrew Equipment Company (NayIor, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
3 3 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Mon 04/09 11:04 AM
ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/9/18. (ki)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/09 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Iron Power, Inc., Rocky Kimbrew and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
Friday, April 06, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/09 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Iron Power, Inc., Rocky Kimbrew ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4389734) filed by McGrew Equipment Company.(pjr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet