California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:18-cv-00587
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:Dec 06, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Oct 06, 2018 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
G and M Oil Company, Inc
Represented By
James E Hart
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Eric Angel
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Gerardo Canchola
Represented By
Adam Morris Rose
Robert L Starr Law Offices Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, December 06, 2018
18 18 order Dismissing Case Thu 12/06 9:28 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Stipulation to Dismiss Case17 , hereby orders this action dismissed WITH prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Wed 12/05 12:05 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by plaintiff Juan Gerardo Canchola.(Rose, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/18 3:38 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER TO REMOVE THIS MATTER FROM THE COURT MEDIATION PANEL PROGRAM15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. This matter is removed from the ADR Procedure No.2, Court Mediation Panel; Private Mediation completion date is February 5, 2019. (iv)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs stip Order Thu 10/18 2:37 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order to Remove this Matter from the Court Mediation Panel Program filed by Defendant G and M Oil Company, Inc.(Angel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation for an Order to Remove this Matter from the Court Mediation Panel Program
Monday, September 24, 2018
14 14 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 09/24 10:52 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849. The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses. Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Thu 08/16 8:14 PM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mku)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 08/16 7:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 1/10/2019. Motions due by 3/11/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 07/09 4:03 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant G and M Oil Company, Inc.. (Angel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/07 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on August 16, 2018. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
9 9 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 04/19 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Eric Angel counsel for Defendant G and M Oil Company, Inc. Changing Firm Name and Address to Littler Mendelson, P.C., 2050 Main Street, Suite 900, Irvine, CA 92614. Changing E-mail to eangel@littler.com. Filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc.. (Angel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 04/10 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant G and M Oil Company, Inc, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on April 10, 2018. (Hart, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/10 12:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/10 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/09 4:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc. (Hart, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Mon 04/09 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc.. Related Case(s): None (Hart, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/09 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc., identifying Juan Gerardo Canchola; G&M Oil Company, Inc.. (Hart, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/09 4:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc.. (Hart, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/09 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018 009765720-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-21556076 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant G&M Oil Company, Inc.. (Attorney James E Hart added to party G&M Oil Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hart, James)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/10 4:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Juan Gerardo Canchola against defendants G and M Oil Company, Inc., Does 1 to 100. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED OF EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (jp)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/10 4:02 PM
UNCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant G and M Oil Company, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED OF EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ).(jp)
Related: [-]