Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:18-cv-00598
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Re-opened:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Nov 23, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 06, 2018 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
AEG Presents, LLC
Represented By
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Krauss
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anschutz Entertainment Group, Inc.
Represented By
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Krauss
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coachella Music Festival, LLC
Represented By
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Krauss
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Goldenvoice, LLC
Represented By
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Krauss
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Anschutz Corporation
Represented By
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Casey M. Nokes
Cable Huston LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Krauss
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Soul'd Out Productions, LLC
Represented By
Kathryn E. Kelly
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info
Thomas M. Triplett
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (bend)
contact info
Angela E. Addae
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
contact info

GPO Oct 12 2018
Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, I GRANT Defendants Motion to Dismiss 18, with prejudice as to Claims Three and Nine. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint is October 25, 2018. Signed on 10/12/2018 by
GPO Mar 14 2019
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, I GRANT Defendants Motion to Dismiss 37, with prejudice as to Claims One, Two, and Three. Claims Four, Five, Six, and Seven are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty days of this Order. Signed on 3/14/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, November 23, 2020
73 73 order Dismissal -Terminate Case Tue 11/24 10:49 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed on 11/23/20 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
72 72 oth_doc Stipulation Fri 11/20 11:08 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal by Soul'd Out Productions, LLC. Filed by Soul'd Out Productions, LLC. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
Related: [-]