County of Multnomah v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45377 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Oregon, 3:17-cv-02010 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD M. SIMON
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Rowan
|
|
Defendant
Stuart Rosenblum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cecil Pickett
|
|
Defendant
Pacific Medical Evaluation and Review Company
|
|
Defendant
Oregon TLC, S-Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Oregon TLC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
New Albertsons Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Fred Meyer
|
|
Defendant
Target Stores
|
|
Defendant
Pro Se Julie Ann DeMille
#79886-065 an Oregon citizen DUBLIN FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels 5701 8TH ST - CAMP PARKS
DUBLIN, CA 94568 |
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-mart Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
WALGREEN CO.
200 WILMOT ROAD
DEERFIELD, IL 60015 |
|
Defendant
Mark Timney
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Pay Less, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Stewart
|
|
Defendant
Ralph Snyderman
|
|
Defendant
Safeway, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Safeway Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PETER BOER
|
|
Defendant
Michael Babich
|
|
Defendant
Roy Blackburn
|
|
Defendant
Alec Burlakoff
|
|
Defendant
PAULO COSTA
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 100, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judy Lewent
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Craig Landau
|
|
Defendant
SUNRISE LEE
|
|
Defendant
John Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Russell Gasdia
|
|
Defendant
Gallant Internal Medicine, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Gallant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J. GURRY
|
|
Defendant
Fusion Wellness Clinic
|
|
Defendant
Fred Meyer, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Multnomah
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:03 PM EDT |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 17CV33413 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5255323 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (1 of 1), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Index, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (1 of 25), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (2 of 25), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (3 of 25), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (4 of 25), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (5 of 25), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (6 of 25), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (7 of 25), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (8 of 25), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (9 of 25), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (10 of 25), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (11 of 25), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (12 of 25), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (13 of 25), | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (14a of 25), | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (14b of 25), | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (15 of 25), | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (16 of 25), | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (17 of 25), | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (18 of 25), | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (19 of 25), | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (20 of 25), | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (21 of 25), | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (22 of 25), | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (23 of 25), | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (24 of 25), | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (25 of 25), | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (1 of 15), | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (2 of 15), | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (3 of 15), | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (4 of 15), | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (5 of 15), | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (6 of 15), | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (7 of 15), | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (8 of 15), | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (9 of 15), | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (10 of 15), | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (11 of 15), | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (12 of 15), | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (13 of 15), | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (14 of 15), | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (15 of 15), | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (1 of 1), | ||
Att: 49 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/18/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (joha) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc. . Filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Kampars, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. fka Watson Pharma, Inc. . Filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Kampars, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Appearance of Nicholas A. Kahl appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and Memorandum of Law . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKesson Corporation. (Clifford, Dwain) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
10 | 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig L. Lowell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5260479. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
11 | 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent L. Crumpton . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5260481. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 Notice of Appearance of Joseph L. Franco appearing on behalf of INSYS Therapeutics, Inc. Filed by on behalf of INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.. (Franco, Joseph) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
13 | 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.. (Franco, Joseph) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. (Pyle, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Hawkes, Peter) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
16 | 16 Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
17 | 17 Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Consideration and, Alternatively, for Extension of Response Deadline . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
18 | 18 Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Stay . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
19 | 19 Notice of Appearance of James R. Dole appearing on behalf of James Gallant Filed by on behalf of James Gallant. (Dole, James) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
20 | 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C.. (Dole, James) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 Notice of Appearance of Amy J. DeLisa appearing on behalf of Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC Filed by on behalf of Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC. (DeLisa, Amy) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
22 | 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Roman) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
23 | 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC. (DeLisa, Amy) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Hunter, Colin) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
25 | 25 Supplemental Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Stay . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
26 | 26 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig L. Lowell for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5260479 issued. Signed on 1/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
27 | 27 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Craig L. Lowell ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cllowell . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
28 | 28 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brent L. Crumpton for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5260481 issued. Signed on 1/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
29 | 29 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Brent L. Crumpton ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: blcrumpton . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
30 | 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew O'Connor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267503. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
31 | 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brien T. O'Connor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267511. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
32 | 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Fitzgerald . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267519. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
33 | 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C.. (Manela, Julia) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
34 | 34 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew O'Connor for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267503 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
35 | 35 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Andrew O'Connor ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: oconnora . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
36 | 36 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267511 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
37 | 37 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Brien T. O'Connor ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: btoconnor . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
38 | 38 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Fitzgerald for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267519 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
39 | 39 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael L. Fitzgerald ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mlfitzgerald . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
40 | 40 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court7 . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
41 | 41 Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
42 | 42 Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. and Per A. Ramfjord Filed by on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
43 | 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
44 | 44 Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court7 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
45 | 45 Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
46 | 46 Response in Opposition to Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Consideration and, Alternatively, for Extension of Response Deadline 17 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
47 | 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument is set for 2/7/2018 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks regarding Motion to Remand to State Court7 and Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
48 | 48 Notice of Appearance of Roman D. Hernandez appearing on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Roman) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
49 | 49 Reply to Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Main Document 49 replaced on 1/25/2018) (cw). [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
50 | 50 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding49 Reply to Motion. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachmen . The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
51 | 51 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. ORDER - Finding as Moot Motion to Expedite/Accelerate17 . The Judge's rulings, as stated on the record, will be incorporated in his Finding and Recommendations that will follow. Brent L. Crumpton and Nicholas A. Kahl present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew O'Connor and Kathleen Carroll Bricken present as counsel for defendant(s) Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company.(Court Reporter Ryan White.)Magistrate Judge John Jelderks presiding. (pg) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
53 | 53 Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #7 should be GRANTED, its request for attorneys' fees and costs should be DENIED, and Mallinckrodt's Motion to Stay #16 should be DENIED as moot. This Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due February 28, 2018. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Signed on 2/14/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
54 | 54 ORDER: Findings & Recommendation53 , Motion to Remand to State Court7 , Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 referred to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for review. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
52 | 52 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on 2/7/18 before Judge John Jelderks, Court Reporter Ryan White, telephone number 503-326-8184 or email ryan_white@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov . Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 2/22/2018. Redaction Request due 3/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018. (White, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
55 | 55 ORDER: Findings & Recommendation53 referral to Chief Judge Mosman is WITHDRAWN. Findings & Recommendation53 is referred to Judge Marco A. Hernandez for review. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
56 | 56 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Samuel) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
57 | 57 Objections to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Remand to State Court7 , Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 53 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
58 | 58 Declaration of Kathleen Bricken . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
59 | 59 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s):57 Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
60 | 60 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to MDL 2804. Certified on 4/5/18 by Deputy Clerk Robert Pitts for the Northern District of Ohio. (dsg) [Transferred from ord on 4/9/2018.] | |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
61 | 61 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oregon. Case number 3:17-cv-02010. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |