Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01178
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2018
Terminated:Apr 30, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
ON Search Partners
Represented By
ON Search Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 30, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/30 12:16 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1178 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
5 5 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/22 3:54 PM
(Document Filed In The Wrong Case) Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding of Christopher Marcus, P.C. and AnnElyse S. Gibbons of Kirkland & Ellis LLP filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of SVT 1100 Perimeter Park, LP,. (Marcus, Christopher) Modified on 8/23/2018 (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
3 3 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 05/14 9:42 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 09, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/09 4:00 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511), Answer due by 5/9/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/09 1:27 PM
Adversary case 18-01178 Complaint against ON Search Partners to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]