Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01232
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2018
Terminated:Apr 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
LA Power Center Corp.
Represented By
LA Power Center Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/01 4:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1232 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 03/31 12:24 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/14 1:56 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Affidavit Wed 11/14 1:50 PM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, June 18, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 9:06 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,3
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 3:28 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against LA Power Center Corp. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 11:21 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 2:21 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/20 4:30 PM
Amended Complaint against LA Power Center Corp. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/10 2:20 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/10/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/10 1:11 PM
Adversary case 18-01232 Complaint against LA Power Center Corp. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]