Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01257
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:Nov 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bruce W. Kingsley
Represented By
Bruce W. Kingsley
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, November 25, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/25 10:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1257 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
18 18 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 11/23 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
17 17 misc PDF Notice Wed 11/20 10:28 AM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 order Judgment Wed 11/20 10:27 AM
Judgment signed on 11/20/2019. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Bruce W. Kingsley, in a total judgment as of $28,505.26 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 19,0084 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 order ~Generic~ Order Wed 11/20 10:16 AM
Order signed on 11/14/2019 for Default Judgment. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 11, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/11 4:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 04, 2019
13 13 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Fri 10/04 2:14 PM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 11/1/19 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 10/29/19 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2019 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/29/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 06/10 8:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Entry of Default Judgement Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, June 02, 2019
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Sun 06/02 5:10 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, May 31, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 06/01 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 05/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
9 9 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 3:20 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against BRUCE W. KINGSLEY Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 1:16 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and COS
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 1:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 12:25 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,1
Thursday, June 28, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/28 2:31 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Bruce W. Kingsley . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 06/26 6:22 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 5:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/11 10:49 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/11/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/11 10:32 AM
Adversary case 18-01257 Complaint against Bruce W. Kingsley to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/11 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01257 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12522885. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1