SunEdison Litigation Trust v. Burnell Controls (Kent) Ltd. (dba Burnell Switchge
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01258 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Burnell Controls (Kent) Ltd. (dba Burnell Switchgear & Control)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/03 9:34 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1258 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service of John Frederick Talbot regarding service of 1st Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Hague Convention Summary of the Document to be Served and Notice Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Burnell Controls (Kent) Ltd. (dba Burnell Switchgear & Control). (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 06/29 7:37 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Amended Complaint against Burnell Controls (Kent) Ltd. (dba Burnell Switchgear & Control) (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/11/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-01258 Complaint against Burnell Controls (Kent) Ltd. (dba Burnell Switchgear & Control) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 04/11 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01258 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12522885. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |