Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01266
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:Nov 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Claro & Cia
Represented By
Claro & Cia
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/20 12:32 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1266 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2019
22 22 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 11/18 12:16 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #21 )
Friday, November 15, 2019
21 21 misc PDF Notice Fri 11/15 1:29 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 order Judgment Fri 11/15 1:28 PM
Judgment signed on 11/15/2019. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Claro & Cia, in a total judgment as of $30,350.00 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 19,0061 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, November 14, 2019
19 19 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 11/14 3:27 PM
Order signed on 11/14/2019 for Default Judgment. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, October 11, 2019
18 18 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/11 4:25 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, October 07, 2019
17 17 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 10/07 2:43 PM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 11/1/19 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 10/29/19 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2019 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/29/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 07/22 8:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding Entry of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 07/03 3:12 PM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 07/03 9:50 AM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Certificate of Default filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 06/29 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 06/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
12 12 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/26 12:08 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Claro & Cia Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/26 10:23 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Service Request Letter and Certificate of Mailing
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Federal Express Proof of Delivery
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Default
Friday, April 12, 2019
10 10 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 6:31 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
9 9 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 1:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
8 8 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 12:35 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/22 3:59 PM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
6 6 misc Letter Tue 08/21 9:49 AM
Letter Requesting Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) service on Claro & Cia Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 07/02 2:57 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Claro & Cia. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 6:51 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/25 3:06 PM
Amended Complaint against Claro & Cia (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 6:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/11 12:06 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/11/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/11 11:38 AM
Adversary case 18-01266 Complaint against Claro & Cia to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/11 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01266 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12522885. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1