Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01267
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:May 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cognizant Technology Solutions
Represented By
Cognizant Technology Solutions
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 03, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/03 12:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1267 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 01/06 12:18 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
9 9 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Tue 11/05 12:54 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/09 11:32 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Affidavit Tue 10/09 11:22 AM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, June 18, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 8:57 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,3
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 2:57 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Cognizant Technology Solutions . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 6:28 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 2:15 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/20 10:06 PM
Amended Complaint against Cognizant Technology Solutions to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/11 12:06 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/11/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/11 11:40 AM
Adversary case 18-01267 Complaint against Cognizant Technology Solutions to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/11 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01267 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12522885. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1