Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01269
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:May 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
DAC Beachcroft
Represented By
DAC Beachcroft
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 03, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/03 1:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1269 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
10 10 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Thu 01/03 10:46 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
8 8 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 12:46 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/24 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Mark G. Ledwin on behalf of DAC Beachcroft. (Ledwin, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 07/18 10:37 AM
Affidavit of Service of John Frederick Talbot regarding service of 1st Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Hague Convention Summary of the Document to be Served and Notice Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 07/03 12:47 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against DAC Beachcroft. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 7:39 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/25 3:07 PM
Amended Complaint against DAC Beachcroft (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 7:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/11 12:08 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/11/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/11 11:44 AM
Adversary case 18-01269 Complaint against DAC Beachcroft to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/11 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01269 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12522885. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1