Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:18-cv-60782
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2018
Terminated:Apr 12, 2018
Last checked: Monday Oct 08, 2018 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark Alan Pierson
Petitioner
Claudia Giovanna Gonzalez Ganoza Espinoza
Represented By
Stephanie Paige Cawein
Stephanie P Cawein PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 13, 2018
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 04/13 10:54 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 4:18-cv-00199, filed 04/13/2018. (jua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/12 10:52 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER to the Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division. The Clerk shall close this case in the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/12/2018. (wc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Supplement Thu 04/12 7:15 AM
SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support of Jurisdictional Argument by Claudia Giovanna Gonzalez Ganoza Espinoza (Cawein, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Clerk's Notice Re Expedited Review - ICARA Only Thu 04/12 6:47 AM
Clerk's Notice Re Expedited Review - Pursuant to Court policy, petitions filed under The Hague Convention and ICARA should be resolved within six-weeks from the initial filing of the petition. See Internal Operating Procedures, Section 2.18.00, on the Courts website. (vjk)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Thu 04/12 10:53 AM
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division electronically. (wc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/11 4:15 PM
First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Claudia Giovanna Gonzalez Ganoza Espinoza. Responses due by 4/25/2018(Cawein, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Ex Parte Motion
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/11 4:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark Alan Pierson. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/11 4:09 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/11 3:52 PM
EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10561935, filed by Claudia Giovanna Gonzalez Ganoza Espinoza.(Cawein, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet