Poulin Ventures, LLC v. Muscle Gauge Nutrition, LLC et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | James A Parker |
Referred: | Jerry H Ritter |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00337 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 08, 2018 2:27 AM MDT |
Defendant
Muscle Gauge Nutrition, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Osagie Osunde
|
|
Defendant
Robert Reed
|
|
Plaintiff
Poulin Ventures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 2 pgs DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defendants in the amount of $75,332.79 by Senior District Judge James A. Parker. (bap) | |
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 2 pgs ORDER QUASHING7 Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (bjp) | |
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 1 pgs Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Muscle Gauge Nutrition, LLC, Osagie Osunde and Robert Reed. (bap) | |
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 PRAECIPE Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment of Defendants by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kaitlyn A. Luck in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default of Defendants, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit and Verified Statement of Account By Brandon Poulin, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Osagie Osundie Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Centralized Verification Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Robert Reed Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Centralized Verification Service | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 2 pgs ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker denying9 Motion for Default Judgment (meq) | |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) | ||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 DECLARATION of Kaitlyn Luck by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
8 | 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Poulin Ventures, LLC (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 2 pgs ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Show Cause Response due by 9/13/2018. (bjp) | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. Osagie Osunde served on 4/12/2018, answer due 5/3/2018. (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. Muscle Gauge Nutrition, LLC served on 4/12/2018, answer due 5/3/2018. (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
4 | 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Robert Reed on 04/18/2018, filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
Alias Summons Issued as to Robert Reed. (kdh) | ||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC.(Luck, Kaitlyn) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SF002955 re1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC.(Luck, Kaitlyn) filed by Poulin Ventures, LLC. (gr) | ||
Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (kdh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) | ||
Summons Issued as to Muscle Gauge Nutrition, LLC, Osagie Osunde, Robert Reed. (kdh) |