HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BAINBRIDGE AND DECATUR COUNTY GEORGIA v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45382 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Middle, 1:18-cv-00066 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Novartis AG
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
J M Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant/Intervenor
David A. Sackler
|
|
Plaintiff
Hospital Authority of Bainbridge and Decatur County Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:01 PM EDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 177 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2836828, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs(GARRARD, HENRY) [Transferred from gamd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BAINBRIDGE AND DECATUR COUNTY GEORGIA. (bcl) [Transferred from gamd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 4/24/2018. (bcl) [Transferred from gamd on 4/11/2018.] | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Ordered on 4/10/2018. (bcl) [Transferred from gamd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00066. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |