Carter County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45392 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 0:18-cv-00035 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:31 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Carter County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:15 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
Conflict Check run. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | ||
Clerk's Note re1 Complaint: MDL Panel (cc: SKV) notified of possible tag along case (MDL No. 2804) by e-mail with a copy of complaint & docket sheet (KSS) [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4030566), filed by Carter County Fiscal Court.(JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: CIVIL CASES RELATED TO COMPLAINTS FILED AGAINST AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION: 1. Effective immediately, the clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al., filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/17.(JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 19) MDL No. 2804 (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. CTO 19 filed in MDL Case Number 2804 (SMT)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 0:18-cv-00035. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |