Town of Man, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45385 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:18-cv-00463 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:32 PM EST |
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bellco Drug Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cedardale Distributors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
|
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAJ Distributors
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
Town of Man, West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:01 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 37 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6307519. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by The Town of Man, West Virginia for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Bellco Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cedardale Distributors LLC, H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SAJ Distributors, The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, re:1 Complaint. (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons submitted as to Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons submitted as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 3 Summons submitted as to Bellco Drug Corp., | ||
Att: 4 Summons submitted as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons submitted as to Cedardale Distributors, | ||
Att: 6 Summons submitted as to Harvard Drug Group, | ||
Att: 7 Summons submitted as to H.D. Smith, | ||
Att: 8 Summons submitted as to McKesson, | ||
Att: 9 Summons submitted as to Miami-Luken, | ||
Att: 10 Summons submitted as to Rite Aid, | ||
Att: 11 Summons submitted as to SAJ Dist., | ||
Att: 12 Summons submitted as to Kroger Limited Partnership I, | ||
Att: 13 Summons submitted as to Kroger Limited Partnership II, | ||
Att: 14 Summons submitted as to Masters Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 15 Summons submitted as to Wal-Mart Stores East | ||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Bellco Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cedardale Distributors LLC, H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SAJ Distributors, The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons issued as to Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons issued as to Bellco, | ||
Att: 4 Summons issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons issued as to Cedardale Distributors, | ||
Att: 6 Summons issued as to Harvard Drug Group, | ||
Att: 7 Summons issued as to H.D. Smith, | ||
Att: 8 Summons issued as to McKesson Corp., | ||
Att: 9 Summons issued as to Miami-Luken, | ||
Att: 10 Summons issued as to Rite Aid of Maryland, | ||
Att: 11 Summons issued as to SAJ Distributors, | ||
Att: 12 Summons issued as to Kroger Limited Partnership I, | ||
Att: 13 Summons issued as to Kroger Limited Partnership II, | ||
Att: 14 Summons issued as to Masters Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 15 Summons issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-19), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/10/2018. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00463. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |