Adkins v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45386 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 21:0801 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:18-cv-00477 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:32 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Chapman
|
|
Defendant
Chip RX, LLC
and RR2, Box 468
Milton, WV 25541 |
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayor David Adkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:38 PM EDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC with complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Lincoln County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0425-6326713. (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 59 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., McKesson Corporation, David Adkins (Ruby, Steven) (Modified on 3/28/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
4 | 4 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation to Stay(Ruby, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:5 EMERGENCY MOTION by David Adkins to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Lincoln County. ERROR: Memorandum filed as attachment to motion. CORRECTION: Memorandum removed and filed at entry #6. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 EMERGENCY MOTION by David Adkins to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Lincoln County (Chafin, H.) (Modified on 3/30/2018 to remove memorandum filed as attachment (attachment #1) to the motion and file at entry #6) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
6 | 6 21 pgs MEMORANDUM by David Adkins in support of5 EMERGENCY MOTION by David Adkins to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Lincoln County. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-19), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
8 | 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/10/2018. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00477. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |