Montgomery County, Tennessee v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45418 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:18-cv-00314 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:33 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montgomery County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:58 PM EDT |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for William Timothy Harvey. MS State Bar status verified as active for Michael J. Fuller. WV State Bar status verified as active for Paul T. Farrell, Jr, R. Edison Hill and Anthony J. Majestro. TX State Bar status verified as active for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV. FL State Bar status verified as active for Peter J. Mougey. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael J. Fuller, Paul T. Farrell, Jr, R. Edison Hill, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, Peter J. Mougey and Anthony J. Majestro: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 4/16/2018. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2638653), filed by Montgomery County, Tennessee.(No summons provided with the complaint.)(dt) Modified on 3/27/2018 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - List of Attorneys | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
Complaint & docket sheet emailed to MDL Clerk re MDL 2804. (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/4/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 19) filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804, transferring case to the ND of Ohio. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio.(af) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 19) received from the ND of Ohio. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; Proposed order submitted to chambers.) (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
8 | 8 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-19) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2804, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/11/18. (dt)[Transferred from tnmd on 4/12/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00314. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |