Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10894
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10894
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10897 |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.
155 Otis St
Northborough, MA 01532-2456 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Dismissing Case - Claims Agent
Tue 01/14 9:31 AM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 12/30/2020 (LAM) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 01/14 9:35 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 05/14 6:10 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.. (Brown, Kimberly) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 05/14 6:09 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.. (Brown, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/17 11:59 AM
Order Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Bertucci's Holdings, Inc. and its affiliates. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Bertucci's Holdings, Inc., Case No. 18-10894 (MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 4/17/2018. (LMC) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 04/16 8:08 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LCo) |
||
Sunday, April 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
List of Creditors
Sun 04/15 11:23 PM
List of Creditors (Verification of Creditors Matrix) Filed by Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.. (Brown, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Sun 04/15 10:52 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bertucci's Corporation, Bertucci's Holdings, Inc., Bertucci's Holdings, LLC, Bertucci's Restaurant Corp., Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc., Bertucci's of Baltimore County, Inc., Bertucci's of Bel Air, Inc., Bertucci's of Columbia, Inc., Bertucci's of White Marsh, Inc., Bertucci's, Inc., Two Ovens Restaurant Corp.. (Brown, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 04/15 10:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10897 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8832059, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 04/15 10:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Bertucci's of Anne Arundel County, Inc.. (Mumford, Kerri) |