Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01307
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2018
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Portland General Electric
Represented By
Portland General Electric
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/04 10:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1307 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
12 12 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 03/25 10:35 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
11 11 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Wed 02/06 4:25 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
10 10 3 pgs order Application, Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/18 11:24 AM
Order Signed On 10/18/2018 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice by Albert N. Kennedy Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, September 17, 2018
9 9 misc Affidavit Mon 09/17 2:44 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, August 24, 2018
8 8 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Fri 08/24 5:40 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Albert N. Kennedy on behalf of Portland General Electric. (Kennedy, Albert)
Related: [-] 4
7 7 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Fri 08/24 5:20 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Albert N. Kennedy on behalf of Portland General Electric. (Kennedy, Albert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 08/24 5:22 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 18-01307 smb) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12737264. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #7
Monday, July 02, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Thursday, June 28, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/28 2:49 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Portland General Electric . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/28 9:11 AM
Amended Complaint against Portland General Electric (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Thu 06/28 9:32 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/08 1:22 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Motion for Admission to Practice, Pro Hac Vice filed by Albert N. Kennedy on behalf of Portland General Electric. (Kennedy, Albert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/16 4:31 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/16/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/16 9:49 AM
Adversary case 18-01307 Complaint against Portland General Electric to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]