Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01312
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2018
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson
Represented By
Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/04 11:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1312 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
9 9 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
8 8 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 09/11 3:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/07 1:54 PM
Affidavit of Service (Corrected) of Rafinyi Bin Ahlias Upon Defendant Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson regarding service of First Amended Complaint and Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, August 06, 2018
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 08/06 12:31 PM
Affidavit of Service of Rafinyi Bin Ahlias regarding service of First Amended Complaint and Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 07/03 10:54 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 7:16 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/26 6:14 PM
Amended Complaint against Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 1:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, April 16, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/16 4:40 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/16/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/16 10:05 AM
Adversary case 18-01312 Complaint against Ttcal-Vi-Reit-Col Jackson to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]