Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01313
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2018
Terminated:Jun 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH
Represented By
TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, June 19, 2020
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 06/20 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 06/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/17 7:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1313 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
23 23 misc PDF Notice Tue 06/16 6:21 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 order Judgment Tue 06/16 6:20 PM
Judgment signed on 6/16/2020. Judgment awarded against Defendant, TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH, in a total judgment as of $80,707.17. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0022 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 order Motion, Default Judgment Tue 06/16 5:30 PM
Order signed on 6/16/2020 Granting Default Judgment Related [+] . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, May 04, 2020
20 20 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 05/04 4:46 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, April 30, 2020
19 19 motion Motion, Default Judgment Thu 04/30 1:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment /Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment (with Notice of Presentment Date: 5/29/2020 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 5/26/2020 at 4:00 p.m.) ( Administrative Entry was Entered to Reflect the Accurate Docket Event Code) Related [+] filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
18 18 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 04/29 2:30 PM
Notice of Presentment / (Presentment Date: 5/29/2020 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 5/26/2020 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 5/29/2020 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/26/2020,(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Second Summons, Complaint, and Affidavit of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Default and Proof of Service Thereof
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order
Friday, April 24, 2020
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 04/24 6:24 PM
Affidavit of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Entry of Default Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, April 23, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/24 12:15 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 04/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 04/23 8:20 PM
Affidavit of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
14 14 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/21 8:57 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/21 8:17 AM
(Entered In Error) Clerk's Entry of Default against TEST CHINA SHH Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn) Modified on 4/21/2020 (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/21 8:16 AM
(Entered In Error) Clerk's Entry of Default against TUV SUD CERT Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn) Modified on 4/21/2020 (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, April 20, 2020
11 11 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/20 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Summons, Complaint and Affidavit of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/20 12:41 PM
Certificate of Service regarding service of 1st Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference, and Hague Convention Notice Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Friday, April 17, 2020
9 9 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/17 10:32 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Fifth Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/5/2020,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, October 14, 2019
8 8 motion Motion, Extend Time Mon 10/14 3:04 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Fourth Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/31/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 6:09 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 2:51 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 07/02 3:57 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 6:53 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/25 12:16 PM
Amended Complaint against TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 1:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, April 16, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/16 5:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/16/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/16 10:07 AM
Adversary case 18-01313 Complaint against TUV SUD Cert & Test China SHH to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]