Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01316
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2018
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vwr Corp.
Represented By
Vwr Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/04 11:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1316 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
12 12 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
11 11 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 04/09 1:59 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, December 20, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/20 10:20 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc Affidavit Thu 12/20 10:06 AM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, August 24, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/24 1:33 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Third Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,7
7 7 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Fri 08/24 12:16 PM
Third Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Vwr Corp. . (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 08/24 11:12 AM
Request for a Third Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/29 8:18 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Monday, June 25, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 06/25 4:55 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Vwr Corp.. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/25 12:19 PM
Amended Complaint against Vwr Corp. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/25 1:10 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 1:21 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, April 16, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/16 5:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/16/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/16 10:12 AM
Adversary case 18-01316 Complaint against Vwr Corp. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]