Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01320
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
ABS Netcom, Inc.
Represented By
ABS Netcom, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/08 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1320 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 02/07 3:25 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Against ABS Netcom, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, January 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 01/05 1:56 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 2/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ)(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 18, 2023
19 19 misc Transcript Wed 01/03 4:10 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/13/2023 at 10:44 AM RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/18/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/26/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/18/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/18/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
17 17 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 10/10 10:27 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ)(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 06, 2023
18 18 misc Transcript Fri 10/13 11:42 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 9/28/2023 RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/4/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScr i ber s, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/13/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/6/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/4/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Wed 08/23 11:04 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order Signed on 8/23/2023 Regarding Status Report. A Status Conference Will be Held on 9/28/2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
15 15 misc Status Report Wed 08/16 5:48 PM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, August 04, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 08/05 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Wed 08/02 2:07 PM
Order Signed on 8/2/2023 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Tue 05/25 4:43 PM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/04 12:09 PM
Order Signed on 5/4/2021 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
9 9 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 09/04 4:46 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
7 7 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Wed 07/25 5:46 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Patrick W. Carothers on behalf of ABS Netcom, Inc.. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 4 4
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/27 4:07 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Friday, June 22, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Fri 06/22 4:07 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against ABS Netcom, Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/22 11:51 AM
Amended Complaint against ABS Netcom, Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/22 1:28 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 10:49 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/17 12:58 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/17/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/17 10:25 AM
Adversary case 18-01320 Complaint against ABS Netcom, Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 04/17 5:06 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01320 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12533971. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1