Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01327
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Terminated:Aug 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Clean Energy of America Group, Inc.
Represented By
Clean Energy of America Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, August 18, 2022
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/18 12:52 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1327 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
21 21 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Fri 07/15 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 07/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #20 )
Monday, July 11, 2022
20 20 misc PDF Notice Mon 07/11 5:57 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 order Judgment Mon 07/11 5:56 PM
Judgment signed on 7/11/2022. Judgment is entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Clean Energy of America Group, Inc., a total judgment as of $334,200.20 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 22,0024 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 order Motion, Default Judgment Mon 07/11 11:08 AM
Order for Default Judgment Signed on 7/11/2022. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 06/15 10:28 AM
Affidavit of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, June 09, 2022
16 16 motion Motion, Default Judgment Thu 06/09 10:19 AM
Motion for Default Judgment (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Default Judgment) (Notice of Presentment Date: July 8, 2022 at 12:00 p.m.) filed by Krista Kulp on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. Responses due by 7/5/2022, (Kulp, Krista)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, 1st Amended Complaint and Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Default and Proof of Service Thereof
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order
Friday, May 27, 2022
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 05/27 4:57 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Certificate of Default, and Entry of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
Thursday, May 26, 2022
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 05/27 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 05/26/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
13 13 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 05/24 2:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 05/24 1:45 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Krista Kulp on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Kulp, Krista)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 2nd Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 05/25 4:44 PM
Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/04 3:22 PM
Order Signed on 5/4/2021 Directing the Submission of a Status Report. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
8 8 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 12:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/20 10:32 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,4
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 06/19 3:30 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. . (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/18 11:36 AM
Amended Complaint against Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/18 12:32 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 6:24 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/17 3:49 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/17/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/17 10:38 AM
Adversary case 18-01327 Complaint against Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 04/17 5:06 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01327 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12533971. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1