California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 5:18-cv-02279
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Terminated:Mar 13, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 14, 2018 2:57 AM PDT
Amicus
Nanette Diaz Barragan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michael F. Bennet
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Howard Berman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Donald S. Beyer, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Earl Blumenauer
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Richard Blumenthal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Cory A. Booker
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Anthony G. Brown
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michael Capuano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Salud O. Carbajal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tony Cardenas
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ben Cardin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Andre Carson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Judy Chu
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David N. Cicilline
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Yvette D. Clarke
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Wm. Lacy Clay
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Emanuel Cleaver, II
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
James Clyburn
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Steve Cohen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gerrold Connolly
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Luis Correa
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Joe Courtney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Joe Crowley
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry Cuellar
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Elijah E. Cummings
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Danny K. Davis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Diana DeGette
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Rosa L. DeLauro
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark DeSaulnier
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John K. Delaney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ted Deutch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Debbie Dingell
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tammy Duckworth
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Richard Durbin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Keith Ellison
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Eliot L. Engel
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Adriano Espaillat
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Elizabeth Esty
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bill Foster
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Lois Frankel
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Marcia L. Fudge
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ruben Gallego
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jimmy Gomez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gene Green
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Raul M. Grijalva
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Luis Gutierrez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Colleen Hanabusa
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Kamala D. Harris
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Alcee L. Hastings
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mazie Hirono
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Steny Hoyer
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Sheila Jackson Lee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Pramila Jayapal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Hakeem Jeffries
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry C. "Hank" Johnson, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ro Khanna
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ruben J. Kihuen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Daniel T. Kildee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John B. Larson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brenda L. Lawrence
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Barbara Lee
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Patrol Officer John Lewis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Zoe Lofgren
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Alan Lowenthal
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nita Lowey
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Michelle Lujan Grisham
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Stephen F. Lynch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Carolyn Maloney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Doris Matsui
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Betty McCollum
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
A. Donald McEachin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
James P. McGovern
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jerry McNerney
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gregory W. Meeks
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Grace Meng
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Gwen Moore
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Constance Morella
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Muslim Advocates
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
NALEO Educational Fund
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Jerrold Nadler
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Grace F. Napolitano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
National Coalition on Black Civic Participation
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Bill Nelson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Rick Nolan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Donald Norcross
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Eleanor Holmes Norton
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Frank Pallone, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jimmy Panetta
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bill Pascrell, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nancy Pelosi
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ed Perlmutter
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Chellie Pingree
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark Pocan
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jared Polis
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Porter
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David E. Price
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Project on Fair Representation
Represented By
Bryan Kipp Weir
Consovoy Mccarthy Park PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Mike Quigley
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jamie Raskin
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Kathleen M. Rice
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jacky Rosen
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Lucille Roybal-Allard
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bobby L. Rush
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Linda T. Sanchez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Sarbanes
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Janice D. Schakowsky
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brian Schatz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Claudine Schneider
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jose Serrano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Brad Sherman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Albio Sires
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
David Skaggs
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Adam Smith
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Peter Smith
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Darren Soto
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Jackie Speier
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mark Takano
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
The Leadership Conference Education Fund
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights
Represented By
Michael A Mugmon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Amicus
Bennie G. Thompson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Mike Thompson
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Dina Titus
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Norma J. Torres
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Juan Vargas
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Filemon Vela
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Nydia M. Velazquez
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Tim Walz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Debbie Wasserman Schultz
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Bonnie Watson Coleman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Henry A. Waxman
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Peter Welch
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
Ron Wyden
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Amicus
John Yarmuth
Represented By
Elizabeth B. Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Defendant
Ron Jarmin
Represented By
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Wilbur L. Ross
Represented By
Carlotta Porter Wells
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Census Bureau
Represented By
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Commerce
Represented By
Kate Bailey
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen Ehrlich
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Black Alliance For Just Immigration
Represented By
Nora Valerie Frimann
Office Of The City Attorney, City Of San Jose
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
John Frederick Libby
Manatt Phelps And Phillips
contact info
Olufunmilayo O Showole
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Dorian Lawrence Spence
Lawyers Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
John William McGuinness
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
John W. McGuinness
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Ana G. Guardado
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Emil Petrossian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Salvador E Perez
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Ezra D Rosenberg
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Jon Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Andrew Claude Case
Manatt, Phelps, And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
City Of San Jose
Represented By
Nora Valerie Frimann
Office Of The City Attorney, City Of San Jose
contact info
Mark Dale Rosenbaum
Public Counsel
contact info
John Frederick Libby
Manatt Phelps And Phillips
contact info
Olufunmilayo O Showole
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Dorian Lawrence Spence
Lawyers Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
John William McGuinness
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
John W. McGuinness
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Ana G. Guardado
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Emil Petrossian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Salvador E Perez
Manatt, Phelps And Phillips, LLP
contact info
Ezra D Rosenberg
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Jon Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Andrew Claude Case
Manatt, Phelps, And Phillips
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/23/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 30, 2019
203 203 NOTICE by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City Of San Jose of Proceedings in Related Action(Guardado, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A