Town of Chandler Indiana v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporationet al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45440 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Southern, 3:18-cv-00064 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:35 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
TOWN OF CHANDLER, INDIANA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:44 PM EDT |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4822201)(Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chou-il Lee on behalf of Plaintiff TOWN OF CHANDLER, INDIANA. (Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of Plaintiff TOWN OF CHANDLER, INDIANA. (Herceg, Manuel) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
4 | 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, on 4/17/2018 IN RE: MDL - 2804 PER CTO #21. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, IN RE: MDL 2804 on April 16, 2018. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 4/17/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00064. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |