Original Case: 1:17-cv-00691

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv.pr-01425
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Terminated:Nov 06, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
WILLIAM WARNECKI, in his individual and official capacity
Defendant
BLAINE WILSON, in his individual and official capacity
Defendant
KEVIN ROHAN, in his individual and official capacity
Defendant - Appellee
RED COATS, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Amanda Vaccaro
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Michael Nicholas Petkovich
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM WARNECKI, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By
Amanda Vaccaro
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Michael Nicholas Petkovich
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BLAINE WILSON, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By
Amanda Vaccaro
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Michael Nicholas Petkovich
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIA OLAYA SABOURI-YAZDI
Represented By
Donna L. Biderman
LAW OFFICE OF DONNA L. BIDERMAN
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2018
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00691-CMH-IDD. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000398709].. [18-1425]

Docket last updated: 11/07/2018 3:28 AM EST
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00691-CMH-IDD. Case manager: CPoulsen. 18-1425 CP [Entered: 04/17/2018 12:34 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00691-CMH-IDD. 18-1425 CP [Entered: 04/17/2018 12:36 PM]
Related: [-]