Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11991

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-50401
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Medi Biotech, LLC
701 Park of Commerce Blvd. Suite 301
Boca Raton, FL 33487
Represented By
Medi Biotech, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Battz Marketing LLC
4451 Twin Lakes Blvd.
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309
Represented By
Battz Marketing LLC
contact info
Defendant
Braverman Brothers LLC
301 Croton Avenue, # 504
Lantana, FL 33462
Represented By
Braverman Brothers LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ian Schaefer, Inc.
1860 N.W. 82nd Avenue
Parkland, FL 33071
Represented By
Ian Schaefer, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Senior Health Network, LLC
7751 Wiles Road, # 103
Coral Springs, FL 33067
Represented By
Senior Health Network, LLC
contact info
Defendant
H&H Wholesale Holdings, Inc.
1099 Rochester Road
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
H&H Wholesale Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Marie's Medical Health Consulting, Inc.
103 Blanchard St. Suite F
Monroe, LA 71291
Represented By
Marie's Medical Health Consulting, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Lennick Holdings, Inc.
20807 Biscayne Blvd., # 304
Aventura, FL 33180
Represented By
Lennick Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Paragon Trust Company
900 Chapel St. 10th Floor
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Paragon Trust Company
contact info
Defendant
Premier Bio-Tech Solutions, LLC
1515 South Federal Highway Suite 304
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Premier Bio-Tech Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles A. Stanziale, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee of Main Avenue Pharmacy, Inc.
McCarter & English, LLP Four Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2025
LETTER RULING regarding Motions to Dismiss (related document(s)12, 41, 53) (LJH)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
175 175 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Thu 04/17 9:30 AM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Filed by Charles A. Stanziale Jr.. Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Rifino, Matthew)
Related: [-]