Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01375
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2018
Terminated:May 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Skyline Steel Inc.
Represented By
Skyline Steel Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/05 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1375 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
10 10 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Wed 04/10 6:28 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Allen G. Kadish. (Kadish, Allen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 04/09 2:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 14, 2019
8 8 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 12:33 PM
Order Signed On 3/14/2019 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice by James Pyle Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, February 07, 2019
7 7 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 02/07 2:36 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by James Pyle on behalf of Skyline Steel Inc.. (Pyle, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/07 2:38 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 18-01375 smb] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13020378. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #7
Monday, October 08, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/08 3:37 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Affidavit Mon 10/08 3:17 PM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/08 11:14 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 06/06 4:17 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Skyline Steel Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/06 9:26 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/17 5:13 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/17/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/17 4:47 PM
Adversary case 18-01375 Complaint against Skyline Steel Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]