Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01385
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2018
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shinsung Solar Energy Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Shinsung Solar Energy Co. Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info

GPO Oct 24 2023
Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed on 10/24/2023 Resolving the Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Defendant's Counterclaims and Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses. (related document(s)23) (Calderon, Lynda)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/23 3:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1385 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Bush, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
53 53 misc Stipulation Fri 12/20 6:14 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, With Prejudice, and Final Document Closing Adversary Proceeding Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]