Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01403
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2018
Terminated:Jan 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hellmann Worldwide Logistics
Represented By
Hellmann Worldwide Logistics
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, January 04, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/04 5:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1403 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
21 21 notice Notice, Dismissal Thu 12/17 3:22 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
20 20 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Fri 10/09 3:17 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A. Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
19 19 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/17 7:46 AM
Order Signed On 8/17/2020 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of J. Barrett Maru Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, August 14, 2020
18 18 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/14 1:52 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael T. Driscoll on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Driscoll, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
17 17 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Tue 03/05 2:09 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. Barrett Marum filed by Michael T. Driscoll on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Driscoll, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/05 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael T. Driscoll on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Driscoll, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 03/05 2:10 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 18-01403 smb] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13067552. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #17
Monday, March 04, 2019
15 15 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 03/04 8:33 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/1/2019. Re: Substituting Counsel Related [+] (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, February 22, 2019
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 02/22 11:59 AM
Stipulation Substituting Counsel Filed by Andrew R Spector on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics.(Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Monday, October 22, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/22 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 misc Affidavit Mon 10/22 10:13 AM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator). Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
11 11 motion Motion, Extend Time Mon 10/15 6:02 PM
Motion to Extend Time Related [+] filed by Andrew R Spector on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
10 10 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/07 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Amber Donner on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Donner, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
9 9 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/30 10:05 AM
Order Signed On 7/30/2018 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Amber Donner Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
8 8 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Wed 07/11 11:21 AM
First Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Andrew R Spector on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 07/11 11:24 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 18-01403 smb) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12665726. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #8
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 07/03 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew R Spector on behalf of Hellmann Worldwide Logistics. (Spector, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 9:03 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3 ,5
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 3:21 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Hellmann Worldwide Logistics . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 9:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 2:20 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/20 5:51 PM
Amended Complaint against Hellmann Worldwide Logistics to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/18 10:57 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/18/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/18 10:50 AM
Adversary case 18-01403 Complaint against Hellmann Worldwide Logistics to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/18 1:32 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01403 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12535355. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1