SunEdison Litigation Trust v. Tokai Carbon USA Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01408 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tokai Carbon USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/10 12:39 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1408 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A. Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) . Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service of Amended Answer Filed by Garry M. Graber on behalf of Tokai Carbon USA Inc.. (Graber, Garry) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Garry M. Graber on behalf of Tokai Carbon USA Inc..(Graber, Garry) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service of Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Garry M. Graber on behalf of Tokai Carbon USA Inc.. (Graber, Garry) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Garry M. Graber on behalf of Tokai Carbon USA Inc.. (Graber, Garry) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Tokai Carbon USA Inc.. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Complaint against Tokai Carbon USA Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Wed 06/27 5:57 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/18/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-01408 Complaint against Tokai Carbon USA Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 04/18 1:32 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01408 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12535355. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |