Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01412
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2018
Terminated:May 11, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Benjamin Fairbanks
Represented By
Benjamin Fairbanks
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/11 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1412 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
7 7 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
6 6 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 06/25 10:58 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/30 4:59 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,3
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 05/30 11:38 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Benjamin . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/29 2:19 PM
Amended Complaint against Benjamin Fairbanks (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 05/29 2:44 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/18 12:13 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/18/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 04/18 11:54 AM
Adversary case 18-01412 Complaint against Benjamin Fairbanks to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/18 1:32 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01412 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12535355. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1