SunEdison Litigation Trust v. Nguyen
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01423 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
My Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/11 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1423 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Supplemental Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against My Nguyen . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 05/29 12:57 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Amended Complaint against My Nguyen (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/18/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-01423 Complaint against My Nguyen to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 04/18 1:32 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01423 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12535355. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |